Maths (Simplification)Test of 26th February

After 40 min Test will close automatically


Maths Test

full-length Test

Please submit below details before proceed

<<Don't worry we wont call its Just for Tracking purpose>>

1 / 50

15 × 15 × 15 + 45² = 3² × ?

2 / 50

(? – 968) ÷ 79 × 4 = 512

3 / 50

84368 + 65466 – 72009 – 13964 = ?

4 / 50

11 × ? × 19 = 19³– 37 × 95

5 / 50

[(288)2 ÷ 24 × 36] ÷ 18 = √?

6 / 50

2 – [ 2 – { 2 – 2 ( 2 + 2 ) } ] = ?

7 / 50

44% of 1950 + 82% of 250 + 62% of ? = 7883

8 / 50

48.3 × 289 ÷ 3.4 ÷ 23 ÷ 68 × 21 = ?³+ 28.125

9 / 50

123 × 8697 ÷ 223 = ? ² + 36

10 / 50

24473 – 12016 – 11037 + 22477 = ? + 9473

11 / 50

11.5% of 288 – ?% of 150 = – 1016.88

12 / 50

12 × 15 + 27 – ? = 28% of 400

13 / 50

(17)2 + 6 × (13)2 – 212 × 6 = ?

14 / 50

25% of 30% of 950 + 6 × 73 = ?

15 / 50

√784 × √6.25 + 56% of 450 = ? + 186

17 / 50

67.5% of 960 + ?% of 640 = 728

18 / 50

94736 + 43693 + 25638 = ?

19 / 50

98643 – 21748 = 51212 + ?

20 / 50

(17.5)²– 472.5 + (13.5)² = ? + 182.25

21 / 50

337.8 × 331.2 ÷ 335 = 33 × 33?

22 / 50

165% of 400 + 85% of 240 = ?% of 1080

23 / 50

– 948 + 147 – ? = – 1432

24 / 50

5004 ÷ 139 – 6 = ?

25 / 50

(17)2+ 6 × (13)2 – 212 × 6 = ?

26 / 50

(4326 + 3189 – 5155) = ? × 59

27 / 50

3640 ÷ 14 × 16 + 340 = ?

28 / 50

235.265 – 483.67 + 956.71 + 33.523 – 17.231 = ?

29 / 50

12% of 555 + 15% of 666 = ?

30 / 50

845²– (529 – 874 + 361) = ?²× 849

31 / 50

632323 + 454545 – 757575 – 157866 = ?

32 / 50

8965 + 3974 + 8652 + 185 = ?

34 / 50

56% of 2400 – 82% of 6000 = ? – 32% of 1800

35 / 50

689 × 6156 ÷ 18% of 684 = 28 × 250 ÷ 8 + ? + 4300

36 / 50

1454 + 2365 + 9710 + 3020 = ?

37 / 50

636 × 5 ÷ 6 + 221 ÷ 17 × 13 = ? + 210

38 / 50

6561 ÷ 9 ÷ 81 = ?

39 / 50

235.265 – 483.67 + 956.71 + 33.523 – 17.231 = ?

40 / 50

29(119 ÷ 17) – 149 + 2006 = ?

41 / 50

(3469.24 + 1209.53 – 2046.27) = ?²+ 2551.5

42 / 50

85% of 620 + x% of 480 = 70% of 890

43 / 50

25% of 680 + 16% of 525 – 22% of 450 = ?

44 / 50

70% of 1680 + ?% of 1750 = 55% of 2820 – 886

45 / 50

13 × ? × 6 = 472 – √625

46 / 50

46% of 1250 + ?% of 4680 = 1183.4

47 / 50

(624 + 146) × 2 ÷ 77 = ? ÷ (– 2)

48 / 50

9 × 9 × 9 + 6 × 6 × 6 = (1.5)? × 35 × 8

50 / 50

189820 – 22624 + 35 × ? – 372 × 28 = 194440

Your score is

Let Everyone know your Achievement.

LinkedIn Facebook Twitter VKontakte
0%

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *